Vajsar, Jiri (CPSO#: 53505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Neurology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6300
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIRI VAJSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAJSAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1993