Vakani, Mohammed Tariq (CPSO#: 57230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cardiostudy
Suite 330
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone: 1-800-706-1134
Fax: 800-592-7801
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cardio Study
Columbus Medical Arts Building.
8333 Weston Road Suite 401
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Canada
Phone: (905) 264-0022
Fax: (905) 264-0085
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Cardiac Care Centre
200 Ronson Drive, Suite 104
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 740-2500
Fax: (416) 740-2502
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vakani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vakani ( CPSO# 57230 )

Business Address:
Dixie Medical Group
Suite 113
1055 Canadian Place
Mississauga ON  L4W 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 212-9600

Business Address:
104 - 200 Ronson Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9
Phone Number: (416) 740-2500

Business Address:
401 - 8333 Weston Road
Vaughan ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 264-0022

Business Address:
301 - 3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 453-8885

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED TARIQ VAKANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1988