Vakilha, Mehrdad (CPSO#: 87730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8 Greystone Walk Drive
Scarborough ON  M1K 5J2
Phone: (416) 266-5888
Fax: (647) 341-8880
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vakilha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vakilha ( CPSO# 87730 )

Business Address:
Suite C1D
8 Greystone Walk Drive
Scarborough ON  M1K 5J2
Phone Number: (416) 266-5888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHRDAD VAKILHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKILHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013