Vakili, Maryam (CPSO#: 87178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall community hospital
Department of Radiology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: 613-938-4240 Ext. 3524
Fax: 613-938-5374
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maryam Vakili Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vakili ( CPSO# 87178 )

Business Address:
2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 824-3252

Business Address:
1370 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Phone Number: (613) 727-1072

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Radiology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6G 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM VAKILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKILI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2010 to 23 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2011 to 03 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2011 to 03 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2013