Valani, Rahim Amirali (CPSO#: 74962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Emergency Medicine
McMaster University
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 The Queensway
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

William Osler Health System
BCH and Peel sites
2100 Bovaird Ave East
Brampton
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rahim Valani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Valani ( CPSO# 74962 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 24 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHIM AMIRALI VALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Jun 2000 to 12 Jul 2000
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 13 Jul 2000 to 09 Aug 2000
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 28 Feb 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2001