Valaris, Georgios (CPSO#: 81113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jun 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Spanish

Education:Universidad Tecnologica De Santiago, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1736 Wyandotte Street West
Windsor ON  N9B 1J1
Phone: (519) 256-8000
Fax: 519-256-4707
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Valaris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Valaris ( CPSO# 81113 )

Business Address:
1736 Wyandotte Street West
Windsor ON  N9B 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 256-8000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jul 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2008 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Georgios Valaris may practise paediatrics only, in ambulatory and community
            setting.