Valeeva, Liliya (CPSO#: 98788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth street EN3 - 438
Department of Anesthesia and Pain
management
University Health Network
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340 3567
Fax: 416 340 3698
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valeeva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Valeeva ( CPSO# 98788 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia
Suite 1207
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 946-0608

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIYA VALEEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALEEVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017