Valencia, Jose Hector (CPSO#: 56914)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 03 Feb 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad De El Salvador, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 1992
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 03 Feb 1995

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Feb 1995
Summary:

 In September 1995, Dr. Valencia pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety 
 with a patient.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Valencia guilty of 
 professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ruled that, had Dr. Valencia's Educational 
 Licence or Certificate of Registration been in force, it would have ordered immediate revocation.  
 To the extent that Dr. Valencia held any Certificate of Registration or claim to such a 
 Certificate, the Committee ordered them to be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 06, 1994