Valente, Angela Cristina Marques (CPSO#: 77105)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 07 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Escola de Medicina e Saude Publica, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 May 2004