Valente, Maria (CPSO#: 65542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 346-1240
Fax: (807) 346-8687
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Valente Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Valente ( CPSO# 65542 )

Business Address:
301 - 1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone Number: (807) 344-7877

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA VALENTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALENTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2007