Valentinis, Alissia Rosa (CPSO#: 79090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 58 and 59
Suite 522
790 Bay Sreet
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 591-1222
Fax: (416) 591-1227
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michaels Hospital
7th Floor - Cardiac Rehab
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 3035
Fax: (416) 864-5334
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alissia Valentinis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Valentinis ( CPSO# 79090 )

Business Address:
Suite 522
Box 58 & 59
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 591-1222

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISSIA ROSA VALENTINIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALENTINIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005