Valerio, Jason (CPSO#: 92571)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2010 to 11 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2012 to 06 Apr 2012
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2012