Valiani, Sabira (CPSO#: 95796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: Suleman, Sabira (used until: 18 Sep 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
Intensive Care Unit
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: 306-655-2085

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABIRA VALIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALIANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2017