Valiante, Taufik Ali (CPSO#: 71618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Neurosurgery
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
West Wing 4W-436
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5460
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taufik Valiante Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Valiante ( CPSO# 71618 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 4W-436
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5460


Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAUFIK ALI VALIANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALIANTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003