Valikangas, Eija Marjatta (CPSO#: 52074)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Finnish

Education:University of Helsinki, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RR Imaging Suite 104 586 Eglinton Avenue East Toronto ON M4P 1P2
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017