Valji, Azim Madatali (CPSO#: 69735)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1993 to 31 Oct 1993
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000