Vallieres, Eric (CPSO#: 53144)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1985 to 31 Dec 1985
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Oct 1997