Vallis, Katherine Anne (CPSO#: 68711)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 27 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008