Valnicek, Stanley Micheal (CPSO#: 64721)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993