Valois, Marie (CPSO#: 74307)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Valois Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Groupe Sante Physimed, 6363 Transcanadienne, ville Saint-Laurent, QC, H4T 1Z9
Date Received: 26 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 20 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 20 Jan 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2002 to 20 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016