Vamvakas, Eleftherios Christos (CPSO#: 78571)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Oct 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2008