Van Allen, Margot Isham (CPSO#: 60230)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Chicago, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 29 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992