Van Arsdell, Glen Scott (CPSO#: 68406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 03 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6420
Fax: (416) 813-7984
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 17 Mar 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLEN SCOTT VAN ARSDELL may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF SURGERY, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. VAN ARSDELL holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. VAN ARSDELL may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. VAN ARSDELL no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. VAN ARSDELL no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. VAN ARSDELL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1997
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003