Van Baardwijk, Susan Lynn (CPSO#: 58553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
801 Mohawk Road West
Suite 205
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone: (905) 389-4384
Fax: (905) 389-1707
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Van Baardwijk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Van Baardwijk ( CPSO# 57117 )
Dr. S. Van Baardwijk ( CPSO# 58553 )

Business Address:
801 Mohawk Road West
Suite 206
Hamilton ON  L9C 6C2
Phone Number: (905) 389-4384

Business Address:
761 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H7
Phone Number: (905) 681-3191

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN LYNN VAN BAARDWIJK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN BAARDWIJK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1988