Van Bussel, Elisabeth Monique (CPSO#: 66704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwod Institute
Geriatric Psychiatry Program
H2- 437, Mental Health Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110 Ext. 47374
Fax: (519) 455-7151
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISABETH MONIQUE VAN BUSSEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN BUSSEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1998