Van Den Berg, Lucretia (CPSO#: 43958)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2179 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 2A9
Phone: (416) 546-4316
Fax: (416) 551-0386
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Den Berg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van Den Berg ( CPSO# 43958 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
2179 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 2A9
Phone Number: (416) 546-4316

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients requesting a copy of their medical records should contact: Blue Pencil Information Security T: 905-847-2583
Date Received: 13 Feb 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018