Van Den Biggelaar, Jane Catherine (CPSO#: 63894)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2000