Van Der Jagt, Richard Henry Constantine (CPSO#: 53302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8804
Fax: (613) 739-6227
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Der Jagt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Van Der Jagt ( CPSO# 53302 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8804

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD HENRY CONSTANTINE VAN DER JAGT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER JAGT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1990