Van Gentevoort, Marlene Ann (CPSO#: 58221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-3675 Ext. 8082
Fax: (613) 732-6342
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marlene Vangentevoort Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Gentevoort ( CPSO# 58221 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
117 Banting Drive
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Phone Number: (613) 584-3333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARLENE ANN VAN GENTEVOORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN GENTEVOORT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988