Van Hees, Jacqueline Maria (CPSO#: 58272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240 Ext. 2227
Fax: (613) 938-5552
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Winchester District
Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420 Ext. 5229
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Van Hees Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Van Hees ( CPSO# 58272 )

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Cornwall Community Hospital
1050 - 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MARIA VAN HEES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN HEES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1988