Van Laeken, Nancy Yvonne (CPSO#: 60494)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 1990