Van Lieshout, Ryan John (CPSO#: 80838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens Health Concerns Clinic
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th Street, Room C142
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35123
Fax: (905) 381-5629
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Van Lieshout Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Van Lieshout ( CPSO# 80838 )

Business Address:
Women's Health Concerns Clinic
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus-Room C142
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN JOHN VAN LIESHOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN LIESHOUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009