Van Mieghem, Tim Nicole Constant (CPSO#: 96852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 May 2016

Expiry Date:  01 Feb 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 May 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, Flemish, French

Education:Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Obstetrics and Gynecology
700 University Avenue, 3-912
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 458-4800 Ext. 8660
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tim Van Mieghem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Van Mieghem ( CPSO# 96852 )
Dr. R. D'souza ( CPSO# 96310 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
Room 3-912
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 May 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tim Nicole Constant Van Mieghem may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Obstetrics and Gynaecology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Van
                        Mieghem  holds  an  academic  appointment  at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically expires  when  Dr.  Van
                  Mieghem no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This certificate is issued on May 10,  2016, and currently has an interim
                  expiry date of February 1, 2019.  The expiry date of this certificate may
                  be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.