Van Noppen, Beth-Anne (CPSO#: 65096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Elliot St.
Perth ON  K7H 3A3
Phone: (613) 267-1660
Fax: (613) 201-5706
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Van Noppen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Van Noppen ( CPSO# 65096 )
Dr. B. Van Noppen ( CPSO# 66827 )

Business Address:
12 Elliot Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A3

Business Address:
Perth and Smith Falls Hospital - Perth Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETH-ANNE VAN NOPPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN NOPPEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996