Van Noppen, Boudewijn Johannes (CPSO#: 66827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Elliot Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A3
Phone: (613) 267-1660
Fax: (613) 201-5706
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Van Noppen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Van Noppen ( CPSO# 65096 )
Dr. B. Van Noppen ( CPSO# 66827 )

Business Address:
12 Elliot Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A3

Business Address:
Perth and Smith Falls Hospital - Perth Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOUDEWIJN JOHANNES VAN NOPPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN NOPPEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 19 Nov 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996