Van Orman, Jordan Richard (CPSO#: 95385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Medical College of Wisconsin, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiac Anesthesiology
U of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street, Room H2410
Ottawa, Ontario, Canada, K1Y 4W7
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: 613-696-7381
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN RICHARD VAN ORMAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. VAN ORMAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. VAN ORMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VAN ORMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. VAN ORMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. VAN ORMAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. VAN ORMAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018