Van Reekum, Robert (CPSO#: 55361)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS General Hospital
Rehabilitation Building
Acquired Brain Injury Program
P O Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (416) 487-4414
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

NRIO
59 Beaver Bend Crescent
Etobicoke ON  M9B 5R2
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-4358
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Canada
Phone: 416-243-3600
Fax: 416-243-8947
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Van Reekum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Van Reekum ( CPSO# 55361 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
General Site
Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 487-4414

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT VAN REEKUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN REEKUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1987