Van Sittert, Lambert Willem (CPSO#: 77411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 732-6111 Ext. 33250
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 102753)
Dr. M. Al-Husari ( CPSO# 84859 )
Dr. L. Van Sittert ( CPSO# 77411 )
Dr. M. Luterman ( CPSO# 59109 )
Dr. M. Kopp ( CPSO# 61467 )
Dr. W. Oelofse ( CPSO# 82011 )
Dr. R. Setrak ( CPSO# 81883 )
Dr. D. James ( CPSO# 55701 )
Dr. P. Kapend ( CPSO# 96224 )
Dr. M. Senechal ( CPSO# 91005 )
Dr. S. Mohajerani ( CPSO# 102800)
Dr. A. Graystone ( CPSO# 94103 )
Dr. D. Heywood ( CPSO# 99423 )

Business Address:
Welland County General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111


Corporation Name: Van Der Walt, Van Sittert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Van Der Walt ( CPSO# 77423 )
Dr. L. Van Sittert ( CPSO# 77411 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
Fonthill Family Medical Centre
Suite 205
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone Number: (905) 735-0725

Business Address:
230 Bertte Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAMBERT WILLEM VAN SITTERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN SITTERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2002