Van Spall, Harriette Gillian Christine (CPSO#: 78001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology
D B R B Suite C3 117
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 40309
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Van Spall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Van Spall ( CPSO# 78001 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology
D B R B ST3
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jan 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARRIETTE GILLIAN CHRISTINE VAN SPALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN SPALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006