Van, Thomas Tho Cuong (CPSO#: 68192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1A
3585 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P4
Phone: (416) 431-0736
Fax: (416) 431-0648
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Van Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Van ( CPSO# 68192 )

Business Address:
1A - 3585 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1G 1P4
Phone Number: (416) 431-0736

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Hawaii

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS THO CUONG VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1996