Van Walraven, Carl Gerald (CPSO#: 63973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Ottawa Health Research Institute
A S B1-003
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4903
Fax: (613) 761-5492
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Van Walraven Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Van Walraven ( CPSO# 63973 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Health Research Institute
Room ASB-1003
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4903

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARL GERALD VAN WALRAVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN WALRAVEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1993