Van Wijngaarden, Mary Hendrika (CPSO#: 57118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 9323, Aberhart Centre
11402 University Ave NW
Edmonton AB  T6G 2J3
Phone: (780) 433-3107
Fax: (780) 433-0289

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY HENDRIKA VAN WIJNGAARDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN WIJNGAARDEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1987