Van Wylick, Richard Cecil (CPSO#: 67738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site
Room 382C
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3359
Fax: (613) 544-3559
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Van Wylick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Van Wylick ( CPSO# 67738 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD CECIL VAN WYLICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN WYLICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998