VanHelder, Tomas (CPSO#: 67806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
McMaster Campus
1200 Main Street West
Room 1B7B
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Fax: (905) 524-2911
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton Street East
3rd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46698
Fax: (905) 577-8223
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tomas Vanhelder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Vanhelder ( CPSO# 67806 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Suite 1B7B
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMAS VANHELDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANHELDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999