Vanassche, Thomas Yves An Yohannes (CPSO#: 102431)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 10 Feb 2014 to 23 Feb 2014
PEAP - Resident - Hematology

McMaster University, 24 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014