Vanast, Walter John (CPSO#: 20982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kateri Memorial Hospital
Kahnawake QC  J0L 1B0
Phone: (450) 638-3930

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 20 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER JOHN VANAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANAST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1974 to 31 Dec 1974
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1975 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 28 Feb 1976
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Dec 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1996