Vance, Laura Marie (CPSO#: 100358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
52 St. Lawrence Street East
Main Floor
Madoc ON  K0K 2K0
Phone: 613-473-4134
Fax: 613-473-4740
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Vance Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Vance ( CPSO# 100358)

Business Address:
52 St. Lawrence Street East
Madoc ON  K0K 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 473-4134

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE VANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015