Vanden Berg, Ingrid Lynn (CPSO#: 52125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 1984

Summary

Former Name: Vroom, Ingrid Lynn (used until: 25 Jun 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital
St Joseph's Care Group
P O Box 2930
580 Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G4
Phone: (807) 343-4300
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGRID LYNN VANDEN BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDEN BERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1984