Vander Klippe, Stephen William (CPSO#: 91721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 480
271 Frances St
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone: (519) 357-3915
Fax: (519) 357-1568
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Vander Klippe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vander Klippe ( CPSO# 91721 )

Business Address:
Wingham Medical Centre
285 Catherine Street
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3758

Business Address:
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN WILLIAM VANDER KLIPPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDER KLIPPE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011