VanderBeek, Laura Eileen (CPSO#: 86380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
385 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N6
Phone: (519) 753-1242
Fax: (519) 753-4925
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

726 Upper James
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: 905-575-5743
Fax: 905-575-7711
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Missisauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 416-521-4099
Fax: 416-521-4089
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura VanderBeek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. VanderBeek ( CPSO# 86380 )
Dr. M. Lanktree ( CPSO# 98461 )

Business Address:
385 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N6
Phone Number: (519) 753-1242

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (416) 521-4099

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA EILEEN VANDERBEEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERBEEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012